Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3525443


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.10.2019 Supplementary search report published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
25.10.2019 Change - classification published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
25.10.2019 Change - classification published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
12.07.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019 Request for examination filed published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
18.06.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
15.05.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
24.04.2019 Amendment by applicant
19.04.2019 Change - representative
19.04.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
14.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication