Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3525443

EP3525443 - CAMERA LENS AND VIDEO CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Chao
No.555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN
02 / YANG, Kun
No.555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN
03 / WANG, Wei
No.555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN
04 / CHEN, Yanting
No.555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN
05 / XU, Jianjun
No.555 Qianmo Road
Binjiang District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)IPAZ
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint-Aubin
91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17857784.717.07.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017CN93128
Priority number, dateCN20161087831208.10.2016         Original published format: CN201610878312
[2019/33]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018064903
Date:12.04.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3525443
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN12.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225, G02B13/14, G02B15/177
[2019/48]
Former International [2019/33]H04N5/225
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAMERAOBJEKTIV UND VIDEOKAMERA[2019/33]
English:CAMERA LENS AND VIDEO CAMERA[2019/33]
French:OBJECTIF DE CAMÉRA ET CAMÉRA VIDÉO[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2019Translation filed 
18.04.2019National basic fee paid 
18.04.2019Search fee paid 
18.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]CN102809429  (CHINESE ACAD INST AUTOMATION) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 0045-0070, and figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]CN105425371  (FUJIAN FORECAM OPTICAL TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 0029-0067, and figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]CN102721469  (CHINESE ACAD INST AUTOMATION) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 0017-0071, and figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]CN202720392U  (JIANGSU NORTH HUGUANG OPTICS ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 0017-0023, and figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]WO2015131009  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs 0037-0074, and figures 1-9 *;
 [A]CN105223699  (CAMA LUOYANG MEASUREMENTS & CONTROLS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *