Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472756

EP3472756 - VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH SYNTAX ELEMENT SIGNALING OF EMPLOYED PROJECTION LAYOUT AND ASSOCIATED VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MediaTek Inc.
No. 1, Dusing Road
1st Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsin-Chu 300 / TW
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Jian-Liang
No.133 Neipi Rd.
Nanjian Vil.
Su'ao Township
Yilan County Taiwan 270 / TW
02 / LIN, Hung-Chih
No.111 Hexing St.
Caotun Township
Nantou County Taiwan 542 / TW
03 / LI, Chia-Ying
12F.
No.10
Ln. 31
Songjhih Rd., Sinyi Dist.
Taipei City Taiwan 11047 / TW
04 / CHANG, Shen-Kai
10F.
No.58
Fuxing 6th Rd.
Zhubei City
Hsinchu County Taiwan 302 / TW
05 / JU, Chi-Cheng
9F.-2
No.42
Lushui Rd.
Hsinchu City Taiwan 300 / TW
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17857848.030.09.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN104849
Priority number, dateUS201662405290P07.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662405290 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018064967
Date:12.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472756
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN12.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/36, G06T3/40, H04N21/81
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG MIT SYNTAXELEMENTSIGNALISIERUNG DES VERWENDETEN PROJEKTIONSLAYOUTS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VIDEODECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH SYNTAX ELEMENT SIGNALING OF EMPLOYED PROJECTION LAYOUT AND ASSOCIATED VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE VIDÉO AVEC SIGNALISATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE SYNTAXE DE CONFIGURATION DE PROJECTION EMPLOYÉE ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO ASSOCIÉS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)