Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3525238

EP3525238 - IMAGING DISPLAY DEVICE AND WEARABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIDE, Yosuke
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / MAEHASHI, Yu
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Masahiro
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
04 / HOSHINO, Katsuyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
05 / OKITA, Akira
c/o CANON KABUSHIKIKAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
06 / ICHIKAWA, Takeshi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17858065.009.08.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017JP28860
Priority number, dateJP2016019941007.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016199410
[2019/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018066225
Date:12.04.2018
Language:JA
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3525238
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/146, G09F9/30, H01L27/144, H01L27/15, H01L27/32, H01L51/50, H04N5/369, H05B33/02, H05B33/12, H05B33/14
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDGEBUNGSANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND WEARABLE-VORRICHTUNG[2019/33]
English:IMAGING DISPLAY DEVICE AND WEARABLE DEVICE[2019/33]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGERIE ET DISPOSITIF PORTABLE[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2019Translation filed 
07.05.2019National basic fee paid 
07.05.2019Search fee paid 
07.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]JPH08102924  (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0029], [0036] to [0037], [0044] to [0046], [0054], [0060] to [0063], [0068] to [0090]; fig. 1 to 2, 7, 15 to 17, 20 to 27 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-7, 9-10, 12-17 [A] 8, 11;
 [YA]JP2007074666  (NEC PERSONAL PRODUCTS CO LTD) [Y] 2-7, 9-10, 12-17 * , paragraphs [0055] to [0064], [0070] to [0082]; fig. 2 to 3, 5 (Family: none) * [A] 8, 11;
 [YA]JP2016174147  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [Y] 3-7, 9-10, 12-17 * , paragraphs [0318] to [0327], [0357] to [0366], [0372] to [0384]; fig. 40, 45 & US 2016/0260835 A1 paragraphs [0374] to [0383], [0413] to [0422], [0429] to [0440]; fig. 40, 45 & US 2017/0271521 A1 * [A] 8, 11;
 [YA]WO2014030551  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 4, 6, 9-10, 12-17 * , paragraphs [0107] to [0113], [0121] to [0122]; fig. 23 & US 2015/0244962 A1 paragraphs [0233] to [0252], [0265] to [0266]; fig. 23 & EP 2890118 A1 & CN 104584535 A * [A] 8, 11;
 [YA]JPH11122544  (SONY CORP) [Y] 17 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0030]; fig. 5 to 9 (Family: none) * [A] 8, 11;
 [A]JPS5919369  (CANON KK) [A] 1-17 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH01106467  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-17 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *