Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3524864

EP3524864 - SEAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Impulse Co., Ltd.
4-23-18 Shonai Sakaemachi Toyonaka-shi
Osaka 561-0834 / JP
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / TARUMOTO, Kazuyoshi
c/o FUJI IMPULSE CO. LTD.
4-23-18 Shonai Sakaemachi
Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0834 / JP
02 / KATAOKA, Yuichiro
c/o FUJI IMPULSE CO. LTD.
4-23-18 Shonai Sakaemachi
Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0834 / JP
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Prüfeninger Straße 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17858184.915.09.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017JP33492
Priority number, dateJP2016019732705.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016197327
[2019/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018066345
Date:12.04.2018
Language:JA
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3524864
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/16, B65B51/10, F16K31/524, F16H19/04, F16H25/00
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/33]
English:SEAL DEVICE[2019/33]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2018Translation filed 
24.04.2018National basic fee paid 
24.04.2018Search fee paid 
24.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB777925  (POWER GAS LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,10 * page 1, line 80 - page 3, line 17; figure . * [I] 5;
 [XI]GB1491779  (IRRIFRANCE) [X] 1,2,4,10 * page 3, line 109 - page 4, line 10; figure 2 * [I] 5
International search[A]WO9421951  (MOTOYAMA ENG WORKS [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , page 4, line 21 to page 6, line 14; fig. 1 & JP 2702610 B2 & US 5653419 A column 3, line 45 to column 4, line 61; fig. 1 *;
 [A]US4700735  (HAMERNIK EDWARD L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , column 7, line 65 to column 9, line 45; fig. 10 to 11 (Family: none) *