Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3524972

EP3524972 - ELECTROCHEMICAL MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Ltd.
10-8, Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
For all designated states
Tohoku University
2-1-1, Katahira
Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / KUNIKATA, Ryota
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited
10-8 Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
02 / HAYASHI, Hiroyuki
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited
10-8 Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
03 / SUDA, Atsushi
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Limited
10-8 Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
04 / INO, Kosuke
c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY
2-1-1 Katahira
Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP
05 / INOUE, Kumi
c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY
2-1-1 Katahira
Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP
06 / MATSUE, Tomokazu
c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY
2-1-1 Katahira
Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17858197.120.09.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017JP33898
Priority number, dateJP2016019781806.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016197818
[2019/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018066358
Date:12.04.2018
Language:JA
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3524972
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/416, C12M1/34, G01N27/30
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHEMISCHE MESSVORRICHTUNG UND WANDLER[2019/33]
English:ELECTROCHEMICAL MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND TRANSDUCER[2019/33]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET TRANSDUCTEUR[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2019Translation filed 
28.03.2019National basic fee paid 
28.03.2019Search fee paid 
28.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2000035412  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-30 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2015151395  (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2017/0015971 A1 whole document & EP 3128000 A1 *;
 [A]WO2014073195  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-30 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0260675 A1 whole document & EP 2918999 A1 & CN 104737010 A *;
 [A]JP2007225425  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [PA]JP6086412B  (Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Ltd.) [PA] 1-30 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2017/110258 A1 *
 [A]  - YUSUKE KANNO et al., "Simulation Analysis of Positional Relationship between Embryoid Bodies and Sensors on an LSI-based Amperometric Device for Electrochemical Imaging of Alkaline Phosphatase Activity", Analytical Sciences, (20150710), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.2116/analsci.31.715, pages 715 - 719, XP055397245 [A] 1-30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2116/analsci.31.715
 [A]  - MUSTAFA SEN et al., "LSI-based amperometric sensor for real-time monitoring of embryoid bodies", Biosensors and Bioelectronics, (20130000), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bios.2013.03.069, pages 12 - 18, XP055397247 [A] 1-30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2013.03.069
 [A]  - KOSUKE INO et al., "Electrochemical Device with Interdigitated Ring Array Electrodes for Investigating the Relationship between Cardiomyocyte Differentiation from Embryonic Stem Cell and Alkaline Phosphatase activity", Electrochemistry, (20130000), vol. 81, no. 9, doi:doi:10.5796/electrochemistry.81.682, pages 682 - 687, XP055397248 [A] 1-30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5796/electrochemistry.81.682
by applicant   - SEN et al., Biosensors and Bioelectronics, (20130000), vol. 48, pages 12 - 18