Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3526018

EP3526018 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REVERSIBLY DYEING SOFT CONTACT LENSES AND MEDICAL EXAMINATION THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019Change - extension statespublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conte, Michael D.
6636 Lake Worth Blvd.
Ste. 300
Lake Worth, TX 76135 / US
[2019/34]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/34]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2019/34]
Application number, filing date17860528.323.03.2017
[2019/34]
WO2017US23884
Priority number, dateUS20161529146912.10.2016         Original published format: US201615291469
[2019/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018071056
Date:19.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3526018
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B29D11/00, G02C7/04, B05C3/02
[2019/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/34]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REVERSIBLEN FÄRBUNG VON WEICHEN KONTAKTLINSEN UND MEDIZINISCHE UNTERSUCHUNG DAVON[2019/34]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REVERSIBLY DYEING SOFT CONTACT LENSES AND MEDICAL EXAMINATION THEREFROM[2019/34]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE COLORATION RÉVERSIBLE DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT SOUPLES ET EXAMEN MÉDICAL ASSOCIÉ[2019/34]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2019National basic fee paid 
03.05.2019Search fee paid 
03.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2012091368  (CONTE MICHAEL D [US]) [Y] 16, 18-20 * , paragraph [0022], claims 1, 11 * [A] 1-15, 17;
 [Y]US3536384  (COCKS GEORGE G) [Y] 16, 18-19 * , col. 2, lines 7-19, 59-61 *;
 [Y]US2006008506  (CIPRIANO DE SOUSA HERMINIO J [PT], et al) [Y] 20 * , paragraph [0074], claim 10 *;
 [A]WO2007103137  (CONTE MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1-20