Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465694

EP3465694 - NON-PERTUBATIVE MEASUREMENTS OF LOW AND NULL MAGNETIC FIELD IN HIGH TEMPERATURE PLASMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAE Technologies, Inc.
19631 Pauling
Foothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GUPTA, Deepak K.
1 Alameda
Irvine, CA 92620 / US
02 / IGNACE, Richard
157 Picadilly Lane
Johnson City, TN 37615 / US
03 / NORDSIECK, Kenneth H.
2807 Ridge Road
Madison, WI 53705 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17862567.902.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35746
Priority number, dateUS201662345571P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345571 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018075095
Date:26.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465694
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:G21B1/05, G21B1/23, H05H1/11, G01J3/00, G01R33/00
[2020/03]
Former International [2019/15]G21B1/05, H05H1/11
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:STÖRUNGSFREIE MESSUNGEN EINES NIEDER- UND NULLMAGNETFELDES BEI HOCHTEMPERATURPLASMEN[2019/15]
English:NON-PERTUBATIVE MEASUREMENTS OF LOW AND NULL MAGNETIC FIELD IN HIGH TEMPERATURE PLASMAS[2019/15]
French:MESURES NON PERTUBATRICES DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE FAIBLE ET NUL DANS DES PLASMAS À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Search fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014300897  (TREADO PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 9-15 * figures 7,8 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0066] - [0070] *;
 [A]  - GOTA H ET AL, "Internal magnetic field measurement on C-2 field-reversed configuration plasmas", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 83, no. 10, doi:10.1063/1.4729497, ISSN 0034-6748, (20121001), pages 10D706 - 10D706, (20120628), XP012161514 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4729497
International search[A]US7599062  (SMITH ROGER [US]) [A] 1-20 * , Fig 2A, 2B, abstract, col 8, In 60-col 0, In 60 *;
 [A]US7477718  (ROSTOKER NORMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , abstract *;
 [A]WO2015048092  (TRI ALPHA ENERGY INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * , abstract, para [001] *