Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536495

EP3536495 - ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE-PERMEABLE SHINY METAL MEMBER, ARTICLE USING SAME, AND METAL THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIO Hajime
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
02 / MACHINAGA Hironobu
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
03 / CHEN Xiaolei
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
04 / TSURUSAWA Toshihiro
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
05 / KUROSE Manami
c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17865289.724.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP38354
Priority number, dateJP2016020800024.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016208000
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018079547
Date:03.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536495
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:B32B9/00, B32B3/14
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE WELLEN DURCHLASSENDES GLÄNZENDES METALLELEMENT, ARTIKEL DAMIT UND DÜNNE METALLSCHICHT[2019/37]
English:ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE-PERMEABLE SHINY METAL MEMBER, ARTICLE USING SAME, AND METAL THIN FILM[2019/37]
French:ÉLÉMENT MÉTALLIQUE BRILLANT PERMÉABLE AUX ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES, ARTICLE UTILISANT CELUI-CI ET FILM MINCE MÉTALLIQUE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2019Translation filed 
02.05.2019National basic fee paid 
02.05.2019Search fee paid 
02.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational searchWO2016125823  [x] (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [x] 1,3-13;
 WO2014126135  [x] (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [x] 1,3-13;
 JP2015182334  [x] (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [x] 12-13;
 JPH08281857  [a] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [a] 1-13;
 JP2001329363  [a] (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [a] 1-13;
 JP2016134320  [a] (TDK CORP) [a] 1-13;
 JPH11268183  [a] (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [a] 1-13;
 JP2002212324  [a] (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO) [a] 1-13;
 WO2011037028  [a] (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [a] 1-13;
 JP2012225041  [a] (AISIN SEIKI) [a] 1-13;
 JP2008080712  [a] (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [a] 1-13;
 JP2003004526  [a] (NISSHA PRINTING) [a] 1-13;
 JP2007093241  [a] (TOYODA GOSEI KK, et al) [a] 1-13
 [X]WO2016125823  (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [X] 1, 3-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0010], [0030], [0042]-[0054], [0062], examples & JP 2016-144930 A *;
 [X]WO2014126135  (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [X] 1, 3-13 * , claim , paragraphs [0001], [0023], [0028]-[0036], example 2, 5, 11 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2015182334  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 12-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0029]-[0031], [0045], fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH08281857  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2001329363  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016134320  (TDK CORP) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & CN 105807986 A & KR 10-2016-0090260 A & TW 201637028 A *;
 [A]JPH11268183  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2002212324  (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2011037028  (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & US 2012/0166023 A1 & EP 2484850 A1 & CN 102510928 A *;
 [A]JP2012225041  (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008080712  (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [A] 1-13 * , entire text & US 2008/0081201 A1 *;
 [A]JP2003004526  (NISSHA PRINTING) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007093241  (TOYODA GOSEI KK, et al) [A] 1-13 * , entire text (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2007144988
 JP2009298006
 JP2010005999