Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471156

EP3471156 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Chang Man
98 Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
02 / KIM, Ki Seok
98 Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
03 / KIM, Won Jung
98 Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
04 / SONG, June O
98 Juam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
 [2019/17]
Former [2019/16]01 / LIM, Chang Man
98, Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
02 / KIM, Ki Seok
98, Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
03 / KIM, Won Jung
98, Huam-ro
Jung-gu
Seoul 04637 / KR
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17866356.329.09.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR11084
Priority number, dateKR2017011184601.09.2017         Original published format: KR 20170111846
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019045166
Date:07.03.2019
Language:KO
[2019/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471156
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.03.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/48, H01L33/52, H01L33/62
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNGSVERPACKUNG[2019/16]
English:LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE PACKAGE[2019/16]
French:BOÎTIER DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2018Translation filed 
07.05.2018National basic fee paid 
07.05.2018Search fee paid 
07.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2012181555  (YOO CHEOL-JUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0061] - [0065]; figure 11 * [A] 3-11;
 [YA]EP2806471  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0037] - [0113] , [0114]; figures 1,5,8,11,12 * [A] 3-11;
 [Y]US2008191227  (KIMURA MITSUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,12,13 * paragraph [0063] *;
 [Y]US5693564  (YU JICK M [US]) [Y] 1,2,12,13 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5003357  (KIM BUN-JOONG [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 27-38 *;
 [YP]US9761516  (KNICKERBOCKER JOHN U [US], et al) [YP] 1,2,12,13 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 47 *;
 [A]US2012025227  (CHAN ALEX CHI KEUNG [CN], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015028372  (NAKANISHI TSUKASA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2a,2b *
International search[XY]KR20110136812  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 12 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0045] and figures 1-2, 16. * [Y] 1-11;
 [Y]KR20160046198  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0027], [0079] and figure 3. *;
 [Y]KR20160057146  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4, 7 * See paragraphs [0057]-[0058] and figures 4, 6. *;
 [Y]JP2017076806  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 5-6, 8-9 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0028] and figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]KR20150078296  (ILJIN LED CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 10-11 * See paragraph [0029] and figure 1. *