Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3535827

EP3535827 - BALANCING A MULTI-CELL BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Change: Validation statespublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
10.01.2020Change - extension statespublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corvus Energy Inc.
Unit 220 - 13155 Delf Place
Richmond, British Columbia V6V 2A2 / CA
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / TANG, Siu Lun Isaac
c/o Unit 220
13155 Delf Place
Richmond British Columbia V6V 2A2 / CA
02 / LOKHORST, David Maurice
c/o Unit 220
13155 Delf Place
Richmond British Columbia V6V 2A2 / CA
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Rusby-Gale, Daniel Matthew
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]Patel, Binesh
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date17866560.007.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CA51323
Priority number, dateUS201662418728P07.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662418728 P
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018081912
Date:11.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3535827
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, H01M10/48
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
TitleGerman:AUSGLEICH EINER MEHRZELLIGEN BATTERIE[2019/37]
English:BALANCING A MULTI-CELL BATTERY[2019/37]
French:ÉQUILIBRAGE D'UNE BATTERIE À CELLULES MULTIPLES[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2019National basic fee paid 
15.05.2019Search fee paid 
15.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
19.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6114835  (PRICE BURT L [US]) [A] 1-35 * Abstract; figs. 1-9b; whole document. *;
 [A]US2006022639  (MOORE STEPHEN W [US]) [A] 1-35 * Abstract; figs. 1-8; whole document. *;
 [A]US2010171503  (FREDETTE STEVEN J [US]) [A] 1-35 * Abstract; figs. 1-4; whole document. *;
 [A]DE10134147  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-35 * Abstract; figs. 1-4; whole document. *