Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536954

EP3536954 - ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR AND REFRIGERATION/AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi-Johnson Controls Air Conditioning, Inc.
16-1, Kaigan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0022 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / OOTA, Ryou
c/o HITACHI, Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / AKATA, Hiroyuki
c/o HITACHI, Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
03 / YOSHIDA, Yasutaka
c/o HITACHI-JOHNSON CONTROLS AIR CONDITIONING, Inc.
16-1 Kaigan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0022 / JP
04 / NAITO, Koji
c/o HITACHI-JOHNSON CONTROLS AIR CONDITIONING, Inc.
16-1 Kaigan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0022 / JP
05 / UEDA, Hideyuki
c/o HITACHI-JOHNSON CONTROLS AIR CONDITIONING, Inc.
16-1 Kaigan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0022 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17866627.718.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP37643
Priority number, dateJP2016021595104.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016215951
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018083981
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536954
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:F04B39/00, C09K5/04, C10M107/24, C10M129/18, C10M129/68, C10M137/04, F04B39/02, F04C18/02, F04C29/00, F25B1/00, C10N30/00, C10N40/02, C10N40/30
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER KOMPRESSOR UND KÜHL-/KLIMATISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/37]
English:ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR AND REFRIGERATION/AIR CONDITIONING DEVICE[2019/37]
French:COMPRESSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉFRIGÉRATION/CLIMATISATION[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018Translation filed 
04.06.2019National basic fee paid 
04.06.2019Search fee paid 
04.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2016140187  (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP [JP]) [X] 1, 3-6, 8 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0136] & TW 201641683 A * [Y] 2, 7;
 [XY]JP2008208262  (NIPPON OIL CORP) [X] 1, 3-6, 8 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0069] (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 7;
 [XY]WO2008105256  (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1, 3-6, 8 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0090] & EP 2128229 A1, paragraphs [0017]-[0090] * [Y] 2, 7;
 [Y]WO2015140869  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2, 7 * , paragraph [0010], fig. 1 (Family: none) *