Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536321

EP3536321 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR TUMORS IDENTIFIED BY PHOSPHORYLATION OF PROTO-ONCOGENE PROTEIN BELONGING TO VAV FAMILY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Tsukuba
1-1-1, Tennodai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CHIBA, Shigeru
c/o University of Tsukuba
1-1-1 Tennodai
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP
02 / YANAGIMOTO, Mamiko
c/o University of Tsukuba
1-1-1 Tennodai
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date17866638.419.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP38595
Priority number, dateJP2016021552102.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016215521
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084053
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536321
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/506, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P43/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHES MITTEL FÜR TUMORE, DIE DURCH PHOSPHORYLIERUNG VON PROTO-ONKOGEN-PROTEIN DER VAV-FAMILIE IDENTIFIZIERT WERDEN[2019/37]
English:THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR TUMORS IDENTIFIED BY PHOSPHORYLATION OF PROTO-ONCOGENE PROTEIN BELONGING TO VAV FAMILY[2019/37]
French:AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE TUMEURS IDENTIFIÉES PAR PHOSPHORYLATION DE PROTÉINE PROTO-ONCOGÈNE APPARTENANT À LA FAMILLE VAV[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2019Translation filed 
29.05.2019National basic fee paid 
29.05.2019Search fee paid 
29.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
29.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]  - TIMPSON, P. et al., "Spatial Regulation of RhoA Activity during Pancreatic Cancer Cell Invasion Driven by Mutant", Cancer Research, (20110201), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 747 - 757, XP055503692 [X] 1-11 * , lower right column, line 3 to p. 755, lower left column, line 5 * [Y] 4-7 [A] 12-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-2267
 [YA]  - PALOMERO, T. et al., "Recurrent mutations in epigenetic regulators", RHOA and FYN kinase in peripheral T cell lymphomas, nature genetics, (20140000), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 166 - 170, XP055354743 [Y] 4-7 * , in particular, abstract * [A] 12-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.2873
 [XYA]  - HACKEN, E. T. et al., "Targeting the LYN/HS1 signaling axis in chronic lymphocytic leukemia", BLOOD, (20130321), vol. 121, no. 12, pages 2264 - 2273, XP055503714 [X] 1-11 * , p. 2268,lower left column, line 6 to right column, line 6, p. 2269, right column, lines 15-30 * [Y] 4-7 [A] 12-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-09-457119
 [YA]  - FELDMAN, A. L. et al., "Recurrent rearrangements of the VAV1 gene in peripheral T- cell lymphomas", Laboratory Investigation, (20150000), vol. 95, no. 1, page 344A, XP9514987 [Y] 4-7 * , Abstract No. 1375, entire text * [A] 12-16
 [YA]  - GUO, S. et al., "Novel Fusion Transcripts Identified in Angioimmunoblastic T Cell Lymphoma", Laboratory Investigation, (20130000), vol. 93, no. 1, XP9514988 [Y] 4-7 * , p. 330A, Abstract No. 1383, entire text * [A] 12-16
 [YA]  - TUFFINL, J. L. et al., "Src family kinases differentially influence glioma growth and motility", MOLECULAR ONCOLOGY, (20151100), vol. 9, pages 1783 - 1798, XP055503725 [Y] 1-2, 4-11 * , abstract, pp. 1787-1790 "Results 3.1" column, p. 1793, left column, lines 20-22, fig. 1, 3B, C * [A] 12-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molonc.2015.06.001
 [A]  - CHANG K. et al., "VAV3 1S REQUIRED FOR P190-BCR-ABL-INDUCED LYMPH01D PROGENITOR TRANSFORMATION AND LEUKEMOGENESIS", Experimental Hematology, (20110000), vol. 39, ISSN 0301-472X, page 1, XP009514175 [A] 1-16 * , S. 39, Abstract No. 01115186 *
 [A]  - MICHELS S . et al., "SRC Signaling is Crucial in the Growth of Synovial Sarcoma Cells", Cancer Research, (20130400), vol. 73, no. 8, pages 2518 - 2528, XP055503728 [A] 1-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-3023
 [A]  - HASSOLD N. et al., "Enhancement of natural killer cell effector functions against selected lymphoma and leukemia cell lines by dasatinib", International Journal of Cancer, (20120915), vol. 131, no. 6, pages E916 - E927, XP055503731 [A] 1-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.27537
by applicantJP2016215521
    - SAKATA-YANAGIMOTO M et al., Nat Genet., (20140200), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 171 - 5
    - SHAH NP. et al., "Overriding imatinib resistance with a novel ABL kinase inhibitor.", Science, (20040000), vol. 305, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1099480, pages 399 - 401, XP002361026

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1099480
    - TALPAZ M et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20060615), vol. 354, no. 24, pages 2531 - 41
    - SAKATA-YANAGIMOTO M et al., Nat. Genet., (20140200), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 171 - 5
    - "NCBI GenBank", Database accession no. NM_001134398.1