Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537078

EP3537078 - REFRIGERATOR AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CHANG, Jinho
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
51 Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 08592 / KR
02 / KIM, Dongjeong
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
51 Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 08592 / KR
03 / CHO, Seungyoon
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
51 Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 08592 / KR
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17866818.203.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017KR12445
Priority number, dateKR2016014589803.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160145898
[2019/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084653
Date:11.05.2018
Language:KO
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537078
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:F25D29/00, F25D23/02, E05F15/73
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLSCHRANK UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON[2019/37]
English:REFRIGERATOR AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME[2019/37]
French:RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase26.04.2019Translation filed 
27.05.2019National basic fee paid 
27.05.2019Search fee paid 
27.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Cited inInternational search[Y]KR101457071B  (RECHNER KOREA CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraph [0047], claim 5 and figure 3. *;
 [Y]KR20150003072U  (PAPK, Soo-Kil) [Y] 1-20 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *;
 [A]KR100740800B  (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1 and figure 2. *;
 [A]KR20010074381  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1 and figure 3. *;
 [A]KR20060000212  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See claim l and figure 5. *