Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537779

EP3537779 - USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEDA, Kazuaki
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC.
SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / TAKEDA, Kazuki
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC.
SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / HARADA, Hiroki
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC.
SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
04 / NAGATA, Satoshi
c/o Intellectual Property Department
NTT DOCOMO INC.
SANNO PARK TOWER
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867168.101.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP39620
Priority number, dateJP2016021571402.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016215714
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084205
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537779
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/06, H04W16/28
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN[2019/37]
English:USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD[2019/37]
French:TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2019Translation filed 
17.05.2019National basic fee paid 
17.05.2019Search fee paid 
17.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2012526466  (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) [A] 1-6 * , abstract & US 2011/0105059 A1, abstract & WO 2010/129610 A2 & KR 10-2012-0011064 A & CN 103889042 A *
 [X]  - NOKIA, "Power Control for MIMO", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis Rl-1610283, (20160930), XP051150300 [X] 1-3, 5
 [X]  - HUAWEI et al., "UL power control for NR MIMO", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis R1-1608821, (20161001), XP051148875 [X] 1, 2, 4-6
by applicantJP2016215714