Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537052

EP3537052 - SOLAR HEAT COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / MOCHIZUKI Kenji
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1 Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867290.309.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP36558
Priority number, dateJP2016021714607.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016217146
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018083946
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537052
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/00, F24S40/46, F24S10/40
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SONNENWÄRMEKOLLEKTOR[2019/37]
English:SOLAR HEAT COLLECTOR[2019/37]
French:COLLECTEUR DE CHALEUR SOLAIRE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2019Translation filed 
30.04.2019National basic fee paid 
30.04.2019Search fee paid 
30.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2015064138  (TOYOTA IND CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0019] *;
 [A]DE102011082767  (SCHOTT SOLAR AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] *;
 [AD]JP2015014444  (TOYOTA IND CORP) [AD] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0039] *;
 [A]WO2011081900  (PRATT & WHITNEY ROCKETDYNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] *
International search[A]JP2015014444  (TOYOTA IND CORP) [A] 1-2 * , abstract, paragraph [0037] (Family: none) cited in the application *;
 [A]WO2011081900  (PRATT & WHITNEY ROCKETDYNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0011]-[0013], fig. 1, 2 & US 2011/0138811 A1 *;
 [A]EP2597395  (ABENGOA SOLAR NEW TECH SA [ES]) [A] 1-2 * , abstract & US 2013/0220308 A1 & CN 103109141 A *;
 [A]US2012186576  (KUCKELKORN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-2 * , abstract & WO 2011/039281 A2 & EP 2581684 A2 & DE 102009045100 A1 & CN 102575873 A & CN 103471267 A *;
 [A]JP2012122693  (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) [A] 1-2 * , paragraph [0035], fig. 3 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015014444