Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537194

EP3537194 - OPTICAL CIRCUIT BOARD, OPTICAL DEVICE, AND ALIGNMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT Electronics Corporation
1-32, Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph And Telephone Corporation
5-1 Otemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANISHI, Tomohiro
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
02 / MINAMI, Motoki
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
03 / KONNO, Satoru
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
04 / SUZUKI, Yuichi
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
05 / SATO, Teruaki
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
06 / NAGASHIMA, Shigeo
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
07 / MINO, Shinji
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
08 / ISHII, Motohaya
c/o NTT ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-32 Shin-Urashimacho 1-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP
09 / SOMA, Shunichi
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
10 / KAMEI, Shin
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
11 / ASAKAWA, Shuichiro
c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center
9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestraße 7
80799 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867307.502.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP39713
Priority number, dateJP2016021719307.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016217193
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084238
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537194
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/122, G02B6/30
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE LEITERPLATTE, OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND AUSRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/37]
English:OPTICAL CIRCUIT BOARD, OPTICAL DEVICE, AND ALIGNMENT METHOD[2019/37]
French:CARTE À CIRCUITS OPTIQUES, DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIGNEMENT[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2019Translation filed 
30.04.2019National basic fee paid 
30.04.2019Search fee paid 
30.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]US2015355421  (LI CHAO [SG], et al) [X] 1, 3-6, 8 * , paragraphs [0078]-[0099], [0104]-[0105], [0109], fig. 7A-9 & WO 2014/112949 A1 * [Y] 2 [A] 7, 9;
 [Y]JPH10300959  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0016], [0025], fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0527130  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-9 * , paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008268763  (KEIO GIJUKU) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH10227936  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014026108  (NEC CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantJPH08313744
 JP2011191647