Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537823

EP3537823 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXECUTING MULTI-BEAM-BASED SCHEDULING REQUEST IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KT Corporation
206 Jeongja-dong
90 Buljeong-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13606 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Ki-tae
Korea Telecom Research Center
Umyeon-dong
151 Taebong-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06763 / KR
02 / CHOI, Woo-jin
Korea Telecom Research Center
Umyeon-dong
151 Taebong-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06763 / KR
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Brevalex
56, Boulevard de l'Embouchure
B.P. 27519
31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867332.327.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017KR12003
Priority number, dateKR2016014695504.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160146955
KR2017013521518.10.2017         Original published format: KR 20170135215
[2019/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084500
Date:11.05.2018
Language:KO
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537823
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, H04W72/04
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINER MEHRSTRAHLBASIERTEN PLANUNGSANFORDERUNG IN DER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION[2019/37]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXECUTING MULTI-BEAM-BASED SCHEDULING REQUEST IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXÉCUTION D'UNE DEMANDE DE PROGRAMMATION MULTI-FAISCEAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2019Translation filed 
13.05.2019National basic fee paid 
13.05.2019Search fee paid 
13.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2015373678  (CHOU CHIE-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1, 7, 13 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0010], [0028], [0033]; and figure 1. * [Y] 2-6, 8-12, 14-18;
 [A]KR20090094105  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0015], [0047], [0057], [0067]; and figure 4. *
 [Y]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on Scheduling in Time Domain for NR", R1-1609281, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis, Lisbon, Portugal, (20161001), XP051159391 [Y] 2-6, 8-12, 14-18 * See sections 1-3; and figures 1-2. *
 [A]  - "Scheduling Request Design for NR", Rl-1610191, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis, Lisbon, Portugal, (20161001), XP051159991 [A] 1-18 * See sections 2-4; and figure 2. *
 [A]  - "NR HARQ and Scheduling Timing", R1-1609542, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86bis, Lisbon, Portugal, (20161001), XP051159612 [A] 1-18 * See section 2. *
by applicantKR20160146955
 KR20170135215