Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537753

EP3537753 - TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD, TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION DETERMINATION METHOD, BASE STATION AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Yijian
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
KejiRoad South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LU, Zhaohua
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LI, Yu Ngok
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / GAO, Bo
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
KejiRoad South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Aipex B.V.
P.O. Box 30223
3001 DE Rotterdam / NL
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867449.502.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN109123
Priority number, dateCN20161097423403.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610974234
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082613
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537753
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN, ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN, BASISSTATION UND ENDGERÄT[2019/37]
English:TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION METHOD, TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION DETERMINATION METHOD, BASE STATION AND TERMINAL[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION, STATION DE BASE, ET TERMINAL[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2019Translation filed 
24.05.2019National basic fee paid 
24.05.2019Search fee paid 
24.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03