Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3537644 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3537644



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 467
12.11.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.10.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.10.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
23.10.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
23.10.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
14.10.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
14.08.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.06.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 55
04.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 55
04.06.2019 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 16
04.06.2019 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 16
04.06.2019 Annex Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 Annex Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
04.06.2019 Description Search / examination 56
04.06.2019 Drawings Search / examination 16
04.06.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.05.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
21.05.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.03.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.05.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
28.05.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
28.05.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
11.05.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.05.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.05.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 47