Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3537644 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201710167223 EP17867486



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019261335Global Dossier 22.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
CN201610982030 04.11.2016
CN201710167223 20.03.2017
WO2017CN109362 03.11.2017
CN201611271245 30.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108023721Global Dossier 11.05.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201610982030 04.11.2016
CN201611271245 30.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3042829Global Dossier 11.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
CN201610982030 04.11.2016
CN201710167223 20.03.2017
WO2017CN109362 03.11.2017
CN201611271245 30.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3537644Global Dossier 20.11.2019A4
EP3537644 11.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
CN201610982030 04.11.2016
CN201710167223 20.03.2017
WO2017CN109362 03.11.2017
CN201611271245 30.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112019009082 12.11.2019A2
Priority number Date
CN201610982030 04.11.2016
CN201710167223 20.03.2017
WO2017CN109362 03.11.2017
CN201611271245 30.12.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2018082661Global Dossier 11.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
CN201610982030 04.11.2016
CN201710167223 20.03.2017
CN201611271245 30.12.2016