Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537644

EP3537644 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / PENG, Jinlin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / DONG, Pengpeng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / WANG, Zongjie
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / ZHANG, Peng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867486.703.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN109362
Priority number, dateCN20161098203004.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610982030
CN20161127124530.12.2016         Original published format: CN201611271245
CN20171016722320.03.2017         Original published format: CN201710167223
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082661
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537644
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L1/18, H04L5/00
[2019/47]
Former International [2019/37]H04L5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2019/37]
English:DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2019Translation filed 
04.06.2019National basic fee paid 
04.06.2019Search fee paid 
04.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]