Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537000

EP3537000 - CENTRIFUGAL CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C.
7000-36, Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka 431-1394 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / AONO Kaoru
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C.
Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo
7000-46 Nakagawa
Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP
02 / YOKOMICHI Yuta
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C.
Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo
7000-46 Nakagawa
Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP
03 / KINE Yuta
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C.
Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo
7000-46 Nakagawa
Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP
04 / KATAOKA Makoto
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C.
Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo
7000-46 Nakagawa
Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Stöckeler, Ferdinand , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867534.422.09.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP34224
Priority number, dateJP2016021685007.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016216850
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018083908
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537000
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:F16D43/18
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZENTRIFUGALKUPPLUNG[2019/37]
English:CENTRIFUGAL CLUTCH[2019/37]
French:EMBRAYAGE CENTRIFUGE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2019Translation filed 
04.06.2019National basic fee paid 
04.06.2019Search fee paid 
04.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Cited inInternational search[A]JP3168535U  (KING ZONE CORPORATION) [A] 1-6 * & US 2011/0240433 A1 & EP 2375093 A2 *;
 [A]JP2015203429  (FCC KK) [A] 1-6 * & WO 2015/156130 A1 *;
 [A]JPS49109752  (JOHANSSON, R. A. G.) [A] 1-6 * & US 3971462 A & DE 2401385 A1 *;
 [A]JPS5372047U  (SUZUKI MOTOR CO., LTD.) [A] 1-6 * (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015203429
 JP2016140425