Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537757

EP3537757 - TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KUSASHIMA, Naoki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SHIMEZAWA, Kazuyuki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / UCHIYAMA, Hiromasa
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / KIMURA, Ryota
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
05 / MATSUDA, Hiroki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867647.403.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP35940
Priority number, dateJP2016021519202.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016215192
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018083929
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537757
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W88/02, H04W24/00, H04W72/12
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2019/37]
English:TERMINAL DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE AND METHOD[2019/37]
French:DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2019Translation filed 
25.04.2019National basic fee paid 
25.04.2019Search fee paid 
25.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2014313908  (DA SILVA ICARO L J [SE], et al) [X] 1,7,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 22] , [0 37] , [ 102]; figures 2, 3, 7b * [A] 2-6,8-13;
 [Y]US2013343252  (CHAKRABORTY SOUMEN [IN], et al) [Y] 3,10 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 41] , [0 52] *;
 [Y]US2015222402  (OUCHI WATARU [JP], et al) [Y] 4-6,11-13 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [XYI]  - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Discussion on initial access and mobility for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160828), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-167912_DISCUSSION ON INITIAL ACCESS AND MOBILITY FOR NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86/Docs/, (20160828), XP051133177 [X] 1,2,7,9,14,15 * page 4 - page 5 * [Y] 3-6,10-13 [I] 8
 [A]  - CMCC, "General views on reference signal design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164892, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160513), XP051096832 [A] 4,11
International search[XY]WO2007145035  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 10-12, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0028], [0031], [0056], [0178], [0210], [0211], [0221], fig. 13, 21, 24, 25 & JP 2012-023770 A & JP 2013-219808 A & JP 2014-239502 A & JP 2016-001929 A & US 2009/0180414 A1, paragraphs [0127]-[0140], [0148]-[0157], [0236]-[0241], [0573], [0646]-[0654], [0678]-[0682], fig. 13, 21, 24, 25 & US 2012/0170485 A1 & US 2016/0366640 A1 & WO 2007/144956 A1 & WO 2007/145006 A1 & EP 2031775 A1 & CN 101361298 A & CN 102858002 A & CN 105050173 A & CN 105050174 A * [Y] 5, 9, 13;
 [Y]JP2012023625  (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 5, 13 * , paragraph [0026] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007295318  (NEC CORP) [Y] 9 * , paragraph [0030] & US 2007/0253372 A1, paragraph [0037] & EP 1855502 A1 & CN 101064962 A *
by applicant   - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Study on Scenarios and Requirements for Next Generation Access Technologies; (Release 14", 3GPP TR 38.913 V0. 3.0, (20160300), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/38_series/38.913/38913-030.zip
    - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 14", 3GPP TR 36.300 V14.0.0, (20160900), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/36_series/36.300/36300-e00.zip