Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536149

EP3536149 - LIQUID SPRAY AGENT FOR PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / IKUBO Satoshi
c/o The Nippon Synthetic Chemical Industry Co. Ltd.
2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0018 / JP
02 / FURO Chizuko
c/o The Nippon Synthetic Chemical Industry Co. Ltd.
2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0018 / JP
03 / MANDAI Shusaku
c/o The Nippon Synthetic Chemical Industry Co. Ltd.
2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0018 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867682.107.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP40120
Priority number, dateJP2016021707507.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016217075
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084313
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536149
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/02, A01N57/28, A01N25/06, C05G3/06
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSZERSTÄUBUNG FÜR PFLANZEN[2019/37]
English:LIQUID SPRAY AGENT FOR PLANTS[2019/37]
French:AGENT DE PULVÉRISATION SOUS FORME LIQUIDE POUR VÉGÉTAUX[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2019Translation filed 
13.03.2019National basic fee paid 
13.03.2019Search fee paid 
13.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2016262381  (FURO CHIZUKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claim - * * example - * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [Y]US6214771  (DEXTER ROBIN W [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * claim - * * column 1, lines 28-42 *;
 [A]JPH08217604  (AGUROSU KK) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2016262375  (RAMAN NARAYAN K [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2015134704  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [Y] 1-6 * , claims, paragraphs [0012], [0014], [0020], [0022], [0025], examples & US 2016/0262381 A1, claims, paragraphs [0013], [0017], [0024], [0026], [0029], examples & WO 2015/093380 A1 & EP 3085680 A1 & AU 2014367924 A & CN 105764873 A *;
 [Y]JPS5382853  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [Y] 1-6 * , claims, page 1, right column, line 17 to page 2, upper left column, line 7, page 2, lower left column to page 3, lower right column, line 11, examples (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS5386890  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [Y] 1-6 * , claims, page 1, line 20 to page 2, upper left column, line 17, page 2, lower left column, line 3 to page 3, lower right column, line 19, examples 1-6 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS5398439  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [Y] 1-6 * , claims, page 2, lower right column, line 6 to page 3, upper left column, line 5, page 3, lower right column, line 8 to page 4, upper right column, examples & US 4192649 A, claims, column 1, line 54 to column 2, line 5, column 2, line 57 to column 3, line 47, examples *