Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3525538

EP3525538 - DOWNLINK INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / MA, Ruixiang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LYU, Yongxia
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17867789.428.09.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017CN103991
Priority number, dateCN20161096531004.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610965310
[2019/33]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082419
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3525538
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04W72/08, H04L1/02, H04L1/08, H04L1/18
[2019/43]
Former International [2019/33]H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04L1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DOWNLINK-INFORMATIONEN[2019/33]
English:DOWNLINK INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE[2019/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2019Translation filed 
10.05.2019National basic fee paid 
10.05.2019Search fee paid 
10.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03