Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536389

EP3536389 - WATER GOLF DRIVING RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kim, Young Rok
302-ho
50 Beomgol-ro
Uijeongbu-si, Gyeonggi-do 11629 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867840.517.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017KR11420
Priority number, dateKR2016014735107.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160147351
KR2017012576928.09.2017         Original published format: KR 20170125769
[2019/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084455
Date:11.05.2018
Language:KO
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536389
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:A63B69/36, A63B67/02, A63B71/02, A63B102/32, A63B47/02, // A63B63/00, A63B71/06
[2019/48]
Former International [2019/37]A63B69/36, A63B67/02, A63B71/02, A63B102/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBUNGSPLATZ FÜR WASSERGOLF[2019/37]
English:WATER GOLF DRIVING RANGE[2019/37]
French:TERRAIN D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE GOLF SUR L'EAU[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2019Translation filed 
06.06.2019National basic fee paid 
06.06.2019Search fee paid 
06.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]KR19990022255U  (AN, Seung Hyuk) [X] 1 * See page 3; claim 1; and figures 1-2,4. * [Y] 2;
 [Y]KR20060023640  (SEO YOUNG SOO [KR]) [Y] 2 * See paragraph [0036]: claim 1; and figure 2. *;
 [A]KR19990033545U  (JANG, Jong Joon) [A] 1-2 * See claims 1-8; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2003148825  (GO SEOG-II [KR]) [A] 1-2 * See paragraph [00251; claim 3; and figure 4. *;
 [A]KR20020070244  (PARK YOUNG KUK [KR]) [A] 1-2 * See page 2; claim 1; and figure 1. *
by applicantKR20090010755U