Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536239

EP3536239 - IN-BLOOD COMPONENT MEASUREMENT METHOD, IN-BLOOD COMPONENT MEASUREMENT DEVICE, AND IN-BLOOD COMPONENT MEASUREMENT PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kowa Company, Ltd.
6-29 Nishiki 3-chome
Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-8625 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / ASANO, Takaharu
c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD.
TOKYO NEW DRUG RESEARCH LABORATORIES
2-17-43 Noguchi-cho
Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189-0022 / JP
02 / YABUSAKI, Katsumi
c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD.
TOKYO NEW DRUG RESEARCH LABORATORIES
2-17-43 Noguchi-cho
Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189-0022 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Ribeiro, James Michael
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867941.102.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP39754
Priority number, dateJP2016021649304.11.2016         Original published format: JP 2016216493
[2019/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084249
Date:11.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536239
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/1455, G01N33/49
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IN-BLUTKOMPONENTEN-MESSVERFAHREN, IN-BLUTKOMPONENTEN-MESSVORRICHTUNG UND IN-BLUTKOMPONENTEN-MESSPROGRAMM[2019/37]
English:IN-BLOOD COMPONENT MEASUREMENT METHOD, IN-BLOOD COMPONENT MEASUREMENT DEVICE, AND IN-BLOOD COMPONENT MEASUREMENT PROGRAM[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE COMPOSANT SANGUIN, DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE COMPOSANT SANGUIN, ET PROGRAMME DE MESURE DE COMPOSANT SANGUIN[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2019Translation filed 
25.04.2019National basic fee paid 
25.04.2019Search fee paid 
25.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2004248716  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * , entire text, fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]  - ZHERNOVAYA O.S. et al., "Monitoring of blood proteins glycation by refractive index and spectral measurements", Laser Physics Letters, (20080228), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 460 - 464, XP055502125 [Y] 1-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/lapl.200810007