Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537624

EP3537624 - BEAM DETERMINATION METHOD, DOWNLINK TRANSMISSION DEMODULATION METHOD, USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Jing
7/F Raycom Infotech Park Tower A
No.2 Kexueyuan South Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
02 / LIU, Liu
7/F Raycom Infotech Park Tower A
No.2 Kexueyuan South Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
03 / JIANG, Huiling
7/F Raycom Infotech Park Tower A
No.2 Kexueyuan South Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100190 / CN
04 / TAKEDA, Fred
Sanno Park Tower
2-11-1 Nagata-cho
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
05 / NAGATA, Satoshi
Sanno Park Tower
2-11-1 Nagata-cho
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867952.830.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN108336
Priority number, dateCN20161097369703.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610973697
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082520
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537624
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/06, H04B7/08
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRAHLFESTLEGUNGSVERFAHREN, DEMODULATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR DOWNLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN, BENUTZERGERÄT UND BASISSTATION[2019/37]
English:BEAM DETERMINATION METHOD, DOWNLINK TRANSMISSION DEMODULATION METHOD, USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE FAISCEAU, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉMODULATION DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2019Translation filed 
31.05.2019National basic fee paid 
31.05.2019Search fee paid 
31.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03