blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3537802

EP3537802 - SUBFRAME CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.07.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Jin
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / HUANG, Shuanghong
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LU, Youxiong
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Aipex B.V.
Vestdijk 51
5611 CA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]Aipex B.V.
P.O. Box 30223
3001 DE Rotterdam / NL
Application number, filing date17867988.202.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN109158
Priority number, dateCN20161095939503.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610959395
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018082620
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537802
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3537802
Date:24.08.2022
Language:EN
[2022/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/00, // H04W4/70, H04W72/04
[2022/12]
CPC:
H04W4/70 (EP); H04W72/0446 (EP,CN,US); H04L41/0813 (US);
G08G1/162 (US); G08G1/166 (US); H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W4/40 (US); H04W56/001 (US); H04W4/44 (EP);
H04W4/46 (EP); H04W4/48 (EP); H04W4/50 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/22]H04W72/04, H04W4/40
Former IPC [2019/37]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SUBFRAME-KONFIGURATION[2019/37]
English:SUBFRAME CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION DE SOUS-TRAME[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2019Translation filed 
03.06.2019National basic fee paid 
03.06.2019Search fee paid 
03.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
10.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2022Fee for grant paid
14.07.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.07.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)25.05.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.11.2017
AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CY24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
IT24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SI24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
IE02.11.2022
LU02.11.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
[2024/26]
Former [2024/21]HU02.11.2017
AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CY24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SI24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
IE02.11.2022
LU02.11.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2024/18]HU02.11.2017
AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SI24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
IE02.11.2022
LU02.11.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/49]AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SI24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
IE02.11.2022
LU02.11.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/48]AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SI24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
IE02.11.2022
LU02.11.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/37]AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SI24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
LU02.11.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/35]AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/31]AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
MC24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/29]AL24.08.2022
AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/23]AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
EE24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SK24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/22]AT24.08.2022
CZ24.08.2022
DK24.08.2022
ES24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RO24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/21]DK24.08.2022
FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/20]FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
SM24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/12]FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
IS24.12.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/11]FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
PL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/10]FI24.08.2022
HR24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
GR25.11.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/09]FI24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
LV24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
PT26.12.2022
Former [2023/08]FI24.08.2022
LT24.08.2022
NL24.08.2022
RS24.08.2022
SE24.08.2022
NO24.11.2022
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - ERICSSON, "Pool design for V2V", vol. RAN WG1, no. Göteborg; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160812), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166974 ERICSSON - POOL DESIGN FOR V2V, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86/Docs/, (20160812), XP051141958 [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2,6,9,13
 [I]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Summary of Wednesday V2V offline discussions", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160828), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-168247 V2V OFFLINE SUMMARY WED V1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86/Docs/, (20160828), XP051133264 [I] 1-13 * paragraph [7.2.2.3] *
 [I]  - ERICSSON, "Pool design for V2V", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisboa, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609726 ERICSSON - POOL DESIGN FOR V2V, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051149760 [I] 1-13 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Corrections on the set of reserved subframes in SL TM 4", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609180 CORRECTION TO RESOURCE RESERVATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051149226 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 1, 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.