Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537802

EP3537802 - SUBFRAME CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Jin
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / HUANG, Shuanghong
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LU, Youxiong
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Aipex B.V.
P.O. Box 30223
3001 DE Rotterdam / NL
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17867988.202.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN109158
Priority number, dateCN20161095939503.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610959395
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082620
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537802
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SUBFRAME-KONFIGURATION[2019/37]
English:SUBFRAME CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION DE SOUS-TRAME[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2019Translation filed 
03.06.2019National basic fee paid 
03.06.2019Search fee paid 
03.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03