Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536167

EP3536167 - LOW-CALORIE CEREAL BAR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samyang Corporation
31, Jong-ro 33-gil
Jongno-gu
Seoul 03129 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Yong In
102-101
2742 Yonggu-daero
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16868 / KR
02 / KIM, Bong Chan
102-801
30 Deongneung-ro 71-gil
Nowon-gu
Seoul 01709 / KR
03 / SEO, Il
302-604
77 Taebong-ro
Gwangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12784 / KR
04 / LEE, Seung Mi
913-2102
276 Dongtandaerosibeom-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18477 / KR
05 / LIM, Hye Jin
419, 40 Yatap-ro 205beon-gil
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13503 / KR
06 / HAN, Tae-Chul
610-1103
91 Hanbora 1-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17081 / KR
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Schrell, Andreas , et al
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17868112.831.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017KR12169
Priority number, dateKR2016014471701.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160144717
[2019/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084535
Date:11.05.2018
Language:KO
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536167
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A23L7/126, A23L29/30, A23L33/125, A23L33/20, A23L25/00, A23L19/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KALORIENARME GETREIDERIEGELZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/37]
English:LOW-CALORIE CEREAL BAR COMPOSITION[2019/37]
French:COMPOSITION DE BARRE DE CÉRÉALES À FAIBLE TENEUR EN CALORIES[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2019Translation filed 
03.06.2019National basic fee paid 
03.06.2019Search fee paid 
03.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]KR20160089551  (TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0069], [0082], [0147], [0149], [0150], [0518], [0519] and claims 1. 17-20,57,58. *;
 [A]KR20130029754  (CJ CHEILJEDANG CORP [KR]) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]KR20110016906  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]WO2015015209  (TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2012076908  (FUJIHARA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document. *
by applicantKR101318422B
 KR101656063B