Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537066

EP3537066 - VAPOUR-LIQUID FILTER MESH, HEAT EXCHANGER AND AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
West Jinji Road
Qianshan
Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Xufeng
West Jinji Road
Qianshan
Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN
02 / HU, Dongbing
West Jinji Road
Qianshan
Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN
03 / HU, Haili
West Jinji Road
Qianshan
Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN
04 / YOU, Haoliang
West Jinji Road
Qianshan
Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN
05 / ZHANG, Ying
West Jinji Road
Qianshan
Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17868468.412.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN105783
Priority number, dateCN20161095756002.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610957560
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082434
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537066
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:F25B43/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DAMPF-FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTERGEWEBE, WÄRMETAUSCHER UND KLIMAANLAGE[2019/37]
English:VAPOUR-LIQUID FILTER MESH, HEAT EXCHANGER AND AIR CONDITIONER[2019/37]
French:MAILLE DE FILTRE VAPEUR-LIQUIDE, ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET CLIMATISEUR[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2019Translation filed 
03.05.2019National basic fee paid 
03.05.2019Search fee paid 
03.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03