Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537781

EP3537781 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING DATA TRANSFER RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / SUN, Yanliang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LIU, Bin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / XU, Kai
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17873017.227.04.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN82255
Priority number, dateCN2016114561424.11.2016         Original published format: CN201611045614
CN20171019332428.03.2017         Original published format: CN201710193324
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018094966
Date:31.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537781
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN31.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/18, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04L1/00
[2019/43]
Former International [2019/37]H04W52/18, H04B7/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSRATE[2019/37]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING DATA TRANSFER RATE[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE DÉBIT DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2019Translation filed 
03.06.2019National basic fee paid 
03.06.2019Search fee paid 
03.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2014071838  (JIA ZHANFENG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0095] *;
 [A]WO2012044861  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] *;
 [A]WO2016179804  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] *
 [Y]  - ERICSSON, "Beam management principles", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609754 BEAM MANAGEMENT PRINCIPLES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051149786 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
International searchCN105556869  [y] (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [y] 1-26;
 CN104349443  [y] (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [y] 1-26;
 CN102045823  [a] (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [a] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 WO2015099497  [a] (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [a] 1-26 * the whole document *