Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537028

EP3537028 - LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE FOR PLANT GROWTH WITH VARIABLE WAVELENGTHS USING QUANTUM DOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sherpa Space Inc.
T134
Truth Hall
193 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34051 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YUN, Choamun
206-504, 147 Baeul 1-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34033 / KR
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Pelkovenstraße 143
80992 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17875294.513.11.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017KR12778
Priority number, dateKR2016016129030.11.2016         Original published format: KR 20160161290
[2019/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018101643
Date:07.06.2018
Language:KO
[2018/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537028
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.06.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:F21K9/60, F21V33/00, A01G7/04, H05B33/08, F21Y115/10, F21W131/109, F21V9/45, F21V14/08, // F21V14/02, F21V23/00
[2019/46]
Former International [2019/37]F21K9/60, F21V33/00, A01G7/04, H05B33/08, F21Y115/10, F21W131/109
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG FÜR PFLANZENWACHSTUM MIT VARIABLEN WELLENLÄNGEN MIT QUANTENPUNKTEN[2019/37]
English:LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE FOR PLANT GROWTH WITH VARIABLE WAVELENGTHS USING QUANTUM DOTS[2019/37]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT AYANT DES LONGUEURS D'ONDE VARIABLES UTILISANT DES POINTS QUANTIQUES POUR LA CROISSANCE DE PLANTES[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2019Translation filed 
05.06.2019National basic fee paid 
05.06.2019Search fee paid 
05.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2015192272  (BERG JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 6,15;
 [I]TW201416610  (SHEEN MAW-TYAN [TW], et al) [I] 1-3,6-8,10-12,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [I]KR20140036799  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-3,6,11,12,15 * the whole document *;
 [XYI]US2016000018  (VAN ELMPT ROB FRANCISCUS MARIA [NL], et al) [X] 7,8,11,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1,3,7 * [Y] 9 [I] 10,13-15;
 [XI]US2013047503  (AIKALA LARS [FI], et al) [X] 7,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0107] * * figures 1b,2,3 * [I] 10;
 [I]US2015128488  (CASPER LARS CHRISTIAN [NL], et al) [I] 7,8,11-14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US2014339983  (HIKMET RIFAT ATA MUSTAFA [NL], et al) [Y] 4,5,9 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] * * figure 8 *
International searchKR20140036799  [y] (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [y] 1-10;
 US2016040833  [y] (ZEHETNER JOHANN [AT], et al) [y] 1-10;
 US2014339983  [y] (HIKMET RIFAT ATA MUSTAFA [NL], et al) [y] 5,10;
 KR20100124808  [a] (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [a] 1-10;
 KR20120120996  [a] [a] 1-10
by applicantKR100883691B
 KR20040010426
 KR20130052306
 KR101185618B