Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537560

EP3537560 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHARGER, AND RELATED DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Jinming
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / DING, Peng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / PAN, Yajun
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17875902.323.03.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN77876
Priority number, dateCN2016117038229.11.2016         Original published format: CN201611070382
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018098942
Date:07.06.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537560
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.06.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES LADEGERÄTS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEM[2019/37]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHARGER, AND RELATED DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE CHARGEUR, ET DISPOSITIF AINSI QUE SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2019Translation filed 
04.06.2019National basic fee paid 
04.06.2019Search fee paid 
04.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Documents cited:Search[A]CN104539001  (SHENZHEN TINNO WIRELESS TECH) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [A]CN103390929  (LIEBERT CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] - [043 ] - [0076]; figures 2-8 *;
 [A]CN105743163  (SHANGHAI YUDE COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0038]; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US9030157  (TING MING-CHIANG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP1487081  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2013082644  (GAGNE NICKOLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *
International searchCN105743163  [y] (SHANGHAI YUDE COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [y] 1-15;
 CN103390929  [y] (LIEBERT CORP) [y] 1-15;
 CN102938572  [a] (NINGBO TCL COMM CO LTD) [a] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantCN20161170382