Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537641

EP3537641 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA PACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Jian
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17877108.527.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN108021
Priority number, dateCN2016117399129.11.2016         Original published format: CN201611073991
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018099221
Date:07.06.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537641
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.06.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04W28/06
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATENPAKETEN[2019/37]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA PACKET[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'UN PAQUET DE DONNÉES[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2019Translation filed 
07.06.2019National basic fee paid 
07.06.2019Search fee paid 
07.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03