Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468244

EP3468244 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / QIU, Lei
No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17878178.730.09.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN105100
Priority number, dateCN20161111831207.12.2016         Original published format: CN201611118312
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018103439
Date:14.06.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468244
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN14.06.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/12, H04W48/16, H04W52/00
[2019/27]
Former International [2019/15]H04W24/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019Translation filed 
03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2013062586  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4 - page 5 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP2566058  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN103259618  (THOMSON LICENSING) [A] 1-15