EP3556907 - ELECTROPLATING METHOD FOR METAL FASTENER AND ELECTROPLATING DEVICE FOR METAL FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1 Kanda Izumi-Cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8642 / JP | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1 Kanda Izumi-Cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8642 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUKAWA, Norio c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 02 /
HASHIBA, Koji c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17879846.8 | 06.09.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017JP32166 | Priority number, date | WO2016JP87127 | 13.12.2016 Original published format: PCT/JP2016/087127 | [2019/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018109998 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556907 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3556907 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25D7/02, A44B19/42, C25D17/12, C25D17/16, C25D21/00, C25D17/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
C25D7/02 (EP);
A44B19/06 (US);
A44B19/42 (EP);
C25D17/00 (EP);
C25D17/005 (EP);
C25D17/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | C25D7/02, A44B19/42, C25D17/12, C25D17/16, C25D21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GALVANISIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR METALLBEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT UND GALVANISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR METALLBEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT | [2019/43] | English: | ELECTROPLATING METHOD FOR METAL FASTENER AND ELECTROPLATING DEVICE FOR METAL FASTENER | [2019/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLECTRODÉPOSITION POUR FERMETURE À GLISSIÈRE MÉTALLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTRODÉPOSITION POUR FERMETURE À GLISSIÈRE MÉTALLIQUE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2019 | Translation filed | 10.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2017 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | IE | 06.09.2021 | LU | 06.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | FR | 18.10.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | GB | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | DE | 01.04.2022 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 18.10.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 18.10.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/41] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 18.10.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS554072U (UNKNOWN) [A] 1-18 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US7208073 (HRADIL GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 61 - column 6, line 28 ** figure 3 *; | [A]CN101608328B (FUJIAN SBS ZIPPER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,5,7 * * claim 1 *; | [A]CN105755515 (CHEN YUANTING) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH059778 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-31* , *; | [A]JP2003041399 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-31 * , *; | [A]JP2003193293 (YKK CORP) [A] 1-31 * , & CN 1429934 A, & FR 2834301 A & IT 20021129 A1 *; | [A]JP2005256131 (YKK CORP) [A] 1-31 * , & CN 1683222 A, 6 & KR 10-2006-0043858 A & TW 200535280 A & IT 20050156 A1 *; | [A]JP2005272875 (YKK CORP) [A] 1-31 * , & CN 1680631 A, 8 & TW 200533788 A * | by applicant | JPH05239699 | JP2514760B | JPH08209383 | JP3087554B | JP2004076092 | JP2004100011 | JP2008202086 | JP5063733B |