blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3501023

EP3501023 - SPEECH RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2024Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.02.2024  [2024/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Sang-yoon
33-409 32 Sinbanpo-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06548 / KR
02 / KIM, Sung-soo
201-101 2 Sanghyeon-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16941 / KR
03 / KIM, Il-hwan
110-21 Seomun-gil
Yeongcheon-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 38846 / KR
04 / LEE, Kyung-min
501-544 25 Yeongtong-ro 290beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16697 / KR
05 / KIM, Nam-hoon
306-503 206 Sunae-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13600 / KR
06 / RYU, Jong-yub
636-1902 16 Dongtanbanseok-ro
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18457 / KR
07 / LEE, Jae-won
105-701 37 Samseong-ro 51-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06280 / KR
 [2019/26]
Representative(s)HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/26]HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date17882510.514.12.2017
[2019/26]
WO2017KR14683
Priority number, dateKR2016017361819.12.2016         Original published format: KR 20160173618
[2019/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018117532
Date:28.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3501023
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.06.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2019
ClassificationIPC:G10L17/02, G10L15/22, G10L15/183, G10L19/04, G10L15/26, G06F17/28
[2019/26]
CPC:
G10L15/197 (EP,US); G10L17/02 (KR); G10L15/183 (KR);
G10L15/22 (EP,KR,US); G10L15/26 (KR); G10L15/30 (US);
G10L19/04 (KR); G10L2015/228 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
TitleGerman:SPRACHERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2019/26]
English:SPEECH RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS[2019/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE[2019/26]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2019National basic fee paid 
19.03.2019Search fee paid 
19.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
08.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2023Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/06]
11.09.2023Date of oral proceedings
18.09.2023Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.09.2023Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2015120287  (STERN BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] *[I] 4,5,11,12
International search[Y]US2005177414  (PRIOGIN SERGEY A [US], et al) [Y] 6-8, 13-14 * See paragraph [0039]; claims 1 and 16; and figure 5. *;
 [Y]US2007112567  (LAU WAI K [US], et al) [Y] 4, 11 * See paragraphs [0019], [0028], and [0054]-[0055]; and figures 2 and 6. *;
 [Y]US2008091435  (STROPE BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 5, 12 * See paragraph [0009]; and claims 10 and 13. *;
 [A]KR20100101986  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0103]-[0109] and figures 2-3. *;
 [XY]US2010312555  (PLUMPE MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 9-10, 15 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0018], [0024], [0031], [0042], and [0050]; claims 1-2, 5, and 8-9; and figures 1-3 and 5-6. * [Y] 4-8, 11-14;
 [Y]US2015120287  (STERN BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [Y] 8 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0018]. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.