blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3561089

EP3561089 - METHOD FOR REFINING MAGNETIC DOMAIN OF GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL PLATE AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.06.2024 [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POSCO Co., Ltd
6261, Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
[2023/29]
Former [2023/06]For all designated states
POSCO Co., Ltd
6261, Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
Former [2022/47]For all designated states
POSCO Holdings Inc.
440, Teheran-ro
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06194 / KR
Former [2019/44]For all designated states
Posco
(Goedong-dong)
6261 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Gyoo-Taek
c/o POSCO
(Goedong-dong)
6261 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
02 / LEE, Ju Seung
c/o POSCO
(Goedong-dong)
6261 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
03 / HONG, Seong-Cheol
c/o POSCO
(Goedong-dong)
6261 Donghaean-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR
 [2019/44]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2023/29]
Former [2019/44]Zech, Stefan Markus
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date17884408.011.12.2017
[2019/44]
WO2017KR14457
Priority number, dateKR2016017841323.12.2016         Original published format: KR 20160178413
KR2017010484618.08.2017         Original published format: KR 20170104846
[2019/44]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2018117510
Date:28.06.2018
Language:KO
[2018/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3561089
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3561089
Date:19.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR16.08.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2019
ClassificationIPC:C21D10/00, C21D8/12, B23K26/364, H01F1/16, C21D11/00
[2019/44]
CPC:
C21D8/1294 (EP,US); B23K26/364 (EP,US); B23K26/57 (US);
C21D10/00 (EP,US); C21D11/00 (EP); C21D8/12 (EP,US);
H01F1/16 (EP,US); C21D2201/05 (EP,US); C21D2221/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERFEINERN EINES MAGNETISCHEN BEREICHS EINER KORNORIENTIERTEN ELEKTROSTAHLPLATTE UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/44]
English:METHOD FOR REFINING MAGNETIC DOMAIN OF GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL PLATE AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2019/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AFFINAGE DE DOMAINE MAGNÉTIQUE D'UNE PLAQUE D'ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE À GRAINS ORIENTÉS, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2019/44]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2019Translation filed 
24.06.2019National basic fee paid 
24.06.2019Search fee paid 
24.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
18.03.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2023Fee for grant paid
13.06.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)22.04.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ19.07.2023
ES19.07.2023
HR19.07.2023
RO19.07.2023
RS19.07.2023
SK19.07.2023
SM19.07.2023
NO19.10.2023
GR20.10.2023
IS19.11.2023
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]HR19.07.2023
RS19.07.2023
SM19.07.2023
NO19.10.2023
GR20.10.2023
IS19.11.2023
Former [2024/10]HR19.07.2023
RS19.07.2023
NO19.10.2023
GR20.10.2023
IS19.11.2023
Former [2024/09]NO19.10.2023
GR20.10.2023
IS19.11.2023
Former [2024/08]NO19.10.2023
GR20.10.2023
Documents cited:Search[YA]KR20110025282  (UNIV CHOSUN IACF [KR]) [Y] 7,8,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0067] , [0080]; figures 1-6d; claims 1-24 * [A] 1-6,9-14;
 [A]EP2902778  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-10; claims 1-13 *;
 [XAY]KR101626599B  (POSCO [KR]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0052] - [0083] , [0114]; figures 1-4; claims 1-24 * [A] 3-6,9,12-14 [Y] 7,8,15;
 [XA]KR20160082603  (POSCO [KR]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0034]; figures 1-5; claims 1-20 * [A] 3-9,12-15;
 [A]EP3098328  (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0045]; claims 1,2 *
International search[A]JP2003117670  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-22* See paragraph [0014] and figures 2, 3. *;
 [Y]KR20110025282  (UNIV CHOSUN IACF [KR]) [Y] 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 11-14, 17 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0028], claim 1 and figure 1. *;
 [Y]KR20130068489  (SUNG WOO HITECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2, 5, 14 * See paragraph [0054], claims 1, 3, 14 and figure 4. *;
 [Y]KR20140087126  (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 11, 12, 17 * See paragraphs [0031], [0032] and claims 3, 4. *;
 [YA]KR101626599B  (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 11-14, 17 * See paragraphs [108], [0109] and claims 1, 13. * [A] 3, 4, 6, 9, 10, 15, 16, 18-22
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.