Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468153

EP3468153 - PROXY-BASED SERVICE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE, AND NETWORK ELEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
27.05.2019Change - classificationpublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Huan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
MTH The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17886508.529.09.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN104555
Priority number, dateCN20161123833828.12.2016         Original published format: CN201611238338
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018120960
Date:05.07.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468153
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN05.07.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROXY-BASIERTES DIENSTVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKELEMENTVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:PROXY-BASED SERVICE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE, AND NETWORK ELEMENT DEVICE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SERVICE BASÉ SUR UN PROXY, DISPOSITIF, ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2015161482  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0095] - [0103] *;
 [X]US2009103451  (LIU JUN LJ [CN], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0 60] - [0087] *;
 [X]US2014064249  (LEE CHUL-KI [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0080] - [0086] *