Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473600

EP3473600 - CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
128 Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Ji Hye
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
02 / PARK, Byung Chun
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
03 / BAEK, So Ra
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
04 / YOO, Tae Gu
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
05 / JUNG, Wang Mo
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17886981.419.12.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017KR15046
Priority number, dateKR2016018102228.12.2016         Original published format: KR 20160181022
KR2017017413118.12.2017         Original published format: KR 20170174131
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018124593
Date:05.07.2018
Language:KO
[2018/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473600
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.07.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:C01G53/00, H01M4/525, H01M4/131, H01M10/0525, H01M4/505
[2019/30]
Former International [2019/17]C01G53/00, H01M4/525, H01M4/131, H01M10/0525
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT[2019/17]
English:CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME[2019/17]
French:MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, SA MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LE COMPRENANT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019Translation filed 
15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2016167439  (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 12,13,15-17 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0105] * [I] 1-11,14;
 [XI]US2005106463  (KIKUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 12,13,16,17 * example - * [I] 1-11,14,15;
 [XI]EP3054508  (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP]) [X] 12,13,16,17 * example - * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]US2008032196  (PARK HONG-KYU [KR], et al) [X] 12,13,16,17 * example - * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]US2013247363  (NELSON JENNIFER A [US], et al) [X] 12,13,16,17 * example - * [I] 1-11,14,15;
 [XI]US2015194673  (TAKAGI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 12,13,16,17 * page 4 - page 7; example - * [I] 1-11,14,15;
 [XI]US2014058598  (MATSUI TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 12,13,16,17 * example - * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]JP2014116296  (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 12,13,16,17 * example - * [I] 1-11,14,15
International search[XYA]KR20130102718  (VINATECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-10, 13 * See paragraphs [0017], [0025]-[0027], [0035], [0038]; and claim 1. * [Y] 11-12 [A] 14-20;
 [XY]KR20160046292  (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 14-20 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0017], [0023]-[0034], [0049], [00611-[0076]; and claims 1-9. * [Y] 11-12;
 [A]KR20160086228  (ECOPRO BM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]JP2012022995  (TDK CORP) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *
 [XY]  - PARK, KANG-JOON et al., "A High-capacity Li[Ni0.8Co0.06Mn0.14]O2 Positive Electrode with a Dual Concentration Gradient for Next -generation Lithium-ion Batteries", Journal of Materials Chemistry A, (20150921), vol. 3, pages 22183 - 22190, XP055427733 [X] 14-20 * See pages 22184-22185. * [Y] 11-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5TA05657H