Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469379

EP3469379 - REAGENT NOZZLE SIPPER MIXING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina, Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DREWS, Bradley Kent
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
02 / WANG, Michael Dai
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
03 / ULMANELLA, Umberto
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
04 / OSMUS, James Michael
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
05 / CLARK, Stephen Wayne
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
06 / WHITACRE, Johanna Lynn
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
07 / PHELPS, Steven Scott
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
08 / ALVAREZ, Michelle L.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
09 / NIZIOLEK, Michael Adalbert
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
10 / BRYAN, Debra Sue
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
11 / DARLAND, Joshua Augustin
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego California 92122 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17890023.921.12.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US67836
Priority number, dateUS201762442765P05.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762442765 P
GB2017000476024.03.2017         Original published format: GB 201704760
US20171584109813.12.2017         Original published format: US201715841098
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018128842
Date:12.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469379
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/10, B01L3/00, G01N35/02, G01N35/00, G01N35/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MISCHSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN MIT REAGENZDÜSENANSAUGER[2019/16]
English:REAGENT NOZZLE SIPPER MIXING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MÉLANGE DE GOUTTEURS À BUSE DE RÉACTIF[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Search fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Cited inInternational search[X]US2015045234  (STONE MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0010], [0023], [0040], [0041], [0044]; claim 1; and figure 10. *;
 [A]US2003086823  (FERNANDO C J ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]US2007202608  (UFFENHEIMER KENNETH F [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO2012166742  (GENAPSYS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]JPH03170061  (HITACHI NAKA SEIKI KK) [A] 1-21 * See the whole document. *