EP3578137 - TOOL FOR TRICUSPID REGURGITATION OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tau Medical Inc. A3, 68 Busandaehak-ro 50beon-gil Geumjeong-gu Busan / KR | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Tau-PNU Medical Co., Ltd. 6109 Engineering Bldg. 6 2 Busandaehak-ro 63beon-gil Geumjeong-gu Busan 46241 / KR | ||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Taupnu Medical Co., Ltd. 6109, Engineering Bldg. 6 2, Busandaehak-ro 63beon-gil Geumjeong-gu Busan 46241 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, June Hong 127-1702 LG Metrocity 111 Bunpo-ro Nam-gu Busan 48516 / KR | 02 /
CHON, Min Ku 604-803 116 Saesil-ro Mulgeum-eup Yangsan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 50658 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jun Oh 101-1308 Daedong Apartment 165 Obong-ro Mulgeum-eup Yangsan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 50595 / KR | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2019/50] | HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Str. 18 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17894825.3 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/50] | WO2017KR14781 | Priority number, date | KR20170014420 | 01.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170014420 | [2019/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143560 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578137 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578137 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61B17/34, A61M25/01, A61B17/02 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
A61F2/2451 (EP,US);
A61F2/2466 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/2433 (KR,US);
A61B17/3421 (KR,US);
A61B17/3468 (KR,US);
A61F2/2427 (KR);
A61M25/01 (KR,US);
A61B2017/00243 (US);
A61B2017/0237 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR TRIKUSPIDALREGURGITATIONOPERATION | [2019/50] | English: | TOOL FOR TRICUSPID REGURGITATION OPERATION | [2019/50] | French: | OUTIL POUR UNE CHIRURGIE DE RÉGURGITATION TRICUSPIDIENNE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2019 | Translation filed | 31.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005096740 (LANGBERG JONATHAN J [US], et al) [A] 8-19* paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076] *; | [Y]WO2015178612 (TAUPNUMEDICAL CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 7,12,18,25 * figure 2 *; | [XDY]KR20150144568 (TAUPNUMEDICAL [KR]) [XD] 8-11,13-17,19 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 12,18; | [Y]WO2016013763 (TAUPNUMEDICAL CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5,23 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figure 6 *; | [XY]US2016213472 (KIM JUNE-HONG [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,20-22,24 * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0078] - paragraph [0086]; figures 14-15 * [Y] 5,7,23,25 | International search | [Y]KR101231140B (PUSAN NAT UNIV IND COOP FOUND [KR]) [Y] 3, 12, 14-20 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0032]; figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20130074823 (KIM JUNE HONG [KR]) [Y] 1-3, 5-11, 14-20, 24 * See paragraphs [0012], [0025]-[0026] figures 1-3. *; | [Y]KR101467373B (PUSAN NAT UNIV IND COOP FOUND [KR]) [Y] 22-24 * See paragraph [0037]. *; | [XYA]KR20150144568 (TAUPNUMEDICAL [KR]) [X] 21 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0039]; claims 1-9; figures 1-3. * [Y] 1-3, 5-12, 14-20 , 22-24 [A] 4, 13, 25; | [PX]KR20170044065 (PUSAN NAT UNIV INDUSTRY-UNIV COOP FOUND [KR]) [PX] 1-25* See claims 1-25. * | by applicant | WO2008060553 | WO2015194816 | KR20150144568 |