Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468719

EP3468719 - FLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Change - inventorpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina, Inc.
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / EARNEY, John, Gerhardt
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / FULLERTON, Justin
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
03 / SMITH, Kaleb
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
04 / VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K.
c/o Illumina, Inc.
IP Legal Department
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
 [2019/30]
Former [2019/26]01 / EARNEY, John, Gerhardt
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / FULLERTON, Justin
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
03 / SMITH, Kaleb
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
04 / VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K.
c/o Illumina, Inc. - IP Legal Department
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 94122 / US
Former [2019/21]01 / EARNEY, John, Gerhardt
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / FULLERTON, Justin
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
03 / SMITH, Kaleb
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
04 / VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K.
c/o Illumina, Inc. - IP Legal Department
5200 Illumina Way
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
Former [2019/16]01 / EARNEY, John, Gerhardt
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / FULLERTON, Justin
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
03 / SMITH, Kaleb
5200 Illumina Way
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
04 / VENKATESAN, Bala, Murali, K.
499 Illinois Street
Suite 210
San Francisco, CA 94158 / US
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17895252.912.12.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US65855
Priority number, dateUS201762452923P31.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762452923 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018144138
Date:09.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468719
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, G01N15/14
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:FLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIFS FLUIDIQUES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Search fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2011157679  (FIKE III EUGENE E [US], et al) [Y] 12, 13, 15-22 * See abstract; paragraphs [0005], [0021], [0024], [0058], [0084], [0160], [0182]; and claims 1, 32. * [A] 1-11, 14;
 [Y]US2003137630  (NIIYA HIROTAKA [JP]) [Y] 12, 13, 15-22 * See paragraph [0027]; claim 1; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2014335301  (VAN T OEVER RONNY [NL], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraph [0023]; claims 21, 36, 39; and figures 2, 3A-3E. *;
 [A]WO2012087369  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0044], [0080], [0081]; claims 1-4, 12-14, 19; and figures 5A-5C. *;
 [A]US2012051523  (FEKE GILBERT [US]) [A] 1-22 * See paragraph [0018]; and claim 1. *