Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471421

EP3471421 - LIVE BROADCAST VIDEO REPLAY METHOD, SERVER, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.01.2020
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wangsu Science & Technology Co., Ltd.
Building A Floor 5
Guangqi Culture Plaza
2899 Xietu Road
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200030 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CAI, Longshi
Building A Floor 5
Guangqi Culture Plaza
No.2899 Xietu Road
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200030 / CN
02 / CAI, Xi
Building A Floor 5
Guangqi Culture Plaza
No.2899 Xietu Road
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200030 / CN
 [2019/17]
Former [2019/16]01 / CAI, Lonshi
Wangsu Science & Technology Co., Ltd.
Building A Floor 5
Guangqi Culture Plaza
2899 Xietu Road, Xuhui District
Shanghai 200030 / CN
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17897207.113.09.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN101633
Priority number, dateCN20171078082601.09.2017         Original published format: CN201710780826
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019041381
Date:07.03.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471421
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.03.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/231, H04L29/06, H04N21/232, H04N21/218, H04N21/2187, H04N21/222, H04N21/2343, H04N21/237, H04N21/2387, H04N21/239, H04N21/262, H04N21/2743, H04N21/2747, H04N21/4223, H04N21/414, H04N21/433, H04N21/472, H04N21/61
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERGABE VON LIVE-VIDEOS, WIEDERGABESERVER UND SYSTEM[2019/16]
English:LIVE BROADCAST VIDEO REPLAY METHOD, SERVER, AND SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SERVEUR, ET SYSTÈME DE REDIFFUSION VIDÉO EN DIRECT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2018Translation filed 
27.08.2018National basic fee paid 
27.08.2018Search fee paid 
27.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
28.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2016173557  (LEE RAY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [I]CN101917590  (CHINA DIGITAL VIDEO BEIJING) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]CN104469433  (TENCENT INC) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 18 * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 7 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, line 21 - line 25 * * page 9, line 1 - line 11 * * page 11, line 21 - line 29 * * figures 3,6 *;
 WO2015035942  [ ] (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]);
 [I]US2014143437  (MATHUR GAURANG [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0085] * * figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US2001047516  (SWAIN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 2,3,5 *;
 [A]US2016073149  (FENG CHAO [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2016077262  (SWARMS VENTURES LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1858263  (SIEMENS SPA ITALIANA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2016309211  (GRASSET JEAN-FRANCOIS BENJAMIN [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0077] * * figure 7 *