blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3598654

EP3598654 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2022
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.06.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.02.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD.
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha, Chang'an
Dongguan
Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2021/27]
Former [2020/04]For all designated states
GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD.
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha, Chang'an
Dongguan
Guangdong 523860 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Zhi
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha, Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
02 / TANG, Hai
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha, Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2021/27]
Former [2020/04]01 / ZHANG, Zhi
No. 18, Haibin Road,
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
02 / TANG, Hai
No. 18, Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2020/04]
Application number, filing date17901106.917.03.2017
[2020/04]
WO2017CN77140
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018165985
Date:20.09.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3598654
Date:22.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3598654
Date:07.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.09.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/06, H04B7/08
[2020/10]
CPC:
H04B7/0695 (EP,RU); H04B7/0628 (EP,RU); H04B7/0632 (RU,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,RU)
Former IPC [2020/04]H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2020/04]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE[2020/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2020/04]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2019Translation filed 
16.10.2019National basic fee paid 
16.10.2019Search fee paid 
16.10.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2019Examination requested  [2020/04]
12.06.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2021Fee for grant paid
28.05.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.05.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP21177480.7  / EP3893407
Opposition(s)08.04.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.03.2017
AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CY07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
MK07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
TR07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
[2024/29]
Former [2024/24]HU17.03.2017
AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CY07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
MK07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2024/23]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CY07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
MK07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2024/20]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CY07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2023/10]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2023/09]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2023/08]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
IE17.03.2022
LU17.03.2022
Former [2022/47]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
MC07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/36]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
IT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/29]AL07.07.2021
AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SI07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/25]AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
SM07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/24]AT07.07.2021
CZ07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
EE07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RO07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
SK07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/21]AT07.07.2021
DK07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/11]AT07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
HR07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
LV07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
PL07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
GR08.10.2021
IS07.11.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/09]AT07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
RS07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
PT08.11.2021
Former [2022/08]AT07.07.2021
ES07.07.2021
FI07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
SE07.07.2021
BG07.10.2021
NO07.10.2021
Former [2022/07]AT07.07.2021
LT07.07.2021
NL07.07.2021
NO07.10.2021
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013045690  (SEOL JI-YUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1,3,4; table 1 *[I] 7,14
International search[A]WO2015147546  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-34;
 [A]CN106160807  (NTT DOCOMO INC)[A] 1-34;
 [X]CN106470062  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-34
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.