EP3604659 - TRACK MECHANISM AND FRONT-LOADER WASHING MACHINE HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuxi Little Swan Electric Co., Ltd. No. 18, South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2021/15] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Wuxi Little Swan Electric Co., Ltd. No. 18, South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONG, Shuai No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 02 /
HE, Hucheng No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Changxing No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Zhigang No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 05 /
TAN, Lufu No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 06 /
JIANG, Tao No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 07 /
YU, Xin No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 08 /
TANG, Yusheng No. 18 South Changjiang Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17903463.2 | 19.09.2017 | [2020/06] | WO2017CN102325 | Priority number, date | CN201710199173 | 29.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710199173 | [2020/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018176748 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604659 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3604659 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/28 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
D06F37/18 (EP,CN,US);
D06F23/02 (US);
D06F37/28 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENMECHANISMUS UND FRONTLADERWASCHMASCHINE DAMIT | [2020/06] | English: | TRACK MECHANISM AND FRONT-LOADER WASHING MACHINE HAVING SAME | [2020/06] | French: | MÉCANISME DE RAIL ET LAVE-LINGE À CHARGEMENT FRONTAL DOTÉ D'UN TEL MÉCANISME DE RAIL | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2019 | Translation filed | 23.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 08.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2017 | AL | 14.04.2021 | AT | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | IT | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | MT | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | TR | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | GB | 19.09.2021 | IE | 19.09.2021 | LU | 19.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | FR | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.09.2017 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
TR | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 19.09.2017 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.09.2017 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
GB | 19.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1652992 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 3, 4, 6A-6C * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058]; figure 7 *; | [A]EP1961856 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015]; figures 5-7 ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]WO2010128734 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 7-12 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0125]; figure 4 * |