Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471266

EP3471266 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING GROUP OF SOLAR TRACKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sungchang Telecom Co., Ltd.
149 (Seochung-dong) Dongchon-ro
Heungdeok-gu
Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 28358 / KR
For all designated states
Sungchang Energy Lab
629 1sunhwan-ro
Seowon-gu
Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 28562 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jae Jin
(Seochon-dog)
149 Dongchon-ro
Heungdeok-gu
Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 28358 / KR
02 / Yoon, Jae Seung
7th Floor, Deokcheon Bldg 7, Teheranro 28-gil
Gangnam-gu Seoul 06220 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17905008.314.08.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR08824
Priority number, dateKR2017009921204.08.2017         Original published format: KR 20170099212
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019027079
Date:07.02.2019
Language:KO
[2019/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471266
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.02.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02S50/00, H02S20/32, F24S50/20, G01D4/00, G01R22/06
[2019/30]
Former International [2019/16]H02S50/00, H02S20/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINER GRUPPE VON SOLARTRACKERN[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING GROUP OF SOLAR TRACKERS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE GROUPE DE SUIVEURS SOLAIRES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2018Translation filed 
17.10.2018National basic fee paid 
17.10.2018Search fee paid 
17.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2010212653  (MCDONALD MARK [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0020] - [0021] - [0023] , [0026] - [0030] * [A] 3,7 [I] 2,4,6,8;
 [A]DE102009021975  (HISTA ELEKTRO ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] - [0025] - [0037] *;
 [A]TW201025644  (ATOMIC ENERGY COUNCIL [TW]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
International search[XYA]KR101745419B  (KWANGMYUNG ELECTRIC ENG CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1, 5 * See paragraphs [23]-[82] and figures 1-10. * [Y] 2, 4, 6, 8 [A] 3, 7;
 [Y]KR101667914B  (HYUNDAI ECO SOLAR CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2, 6, 8 * See paragraphs [21]-[41] and figures 1-5. *;
 [Y]KR20130110981  (PARU CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4, 8 * See paragraphs [19]-[23], [34]-[64] and figures 1-5. *;
 [A]JP2012186263  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. *;
 [A]US2017070187  (JAIN APURAV PADAM [IN], et al) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. *